UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE, CALDICOT AND DISTRICT BRANCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE :a time of creativity and fulfilment for Older People
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Monmouthshire
Governance
- 09 September 1998: Standard registration
- U3A CALDICOT DISTRICT BRANCH (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert Harry | Chair | 21 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Cynthia McOwen | Trustee | 27 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joy Ganesh | Trustee | 31 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Linda Joan Stewart | Trustee | 19 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Waite | Trustee | 19 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Linda Howells | Trustee | 19 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Glenice Frances Anne Dallow | Trustee | 19 April 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £78.98k | £29.08k | £8.39k | £6.12k | £6.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £87.25k | £35.96k | £8.32k | £3.53k | £8.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 May 2024 | 114 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 AUGUST 1998 AS AMENDED ON 19 APR 2018 AS AMENDED ON 20 SEP 2018
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK, BY ALL MEANS INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT, IN CALDICOT AND ITS SURROUNDING LOCALITY.
Area of benefit
CALDICOT AND SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
42 Church Road
CALDICOT
Gwent
NP26 4HW
- Phone:
- 01291 421282
- Email:
- leechpool@talktalk.net
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window