THE QUAY FOYER
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust provides charitable support for the Quay Foyer, a project providing accommodation and training for young people aged 16 - 25, which is owned and managed by Stonewater Ltd. Contributions from the Trust are used primarily to fund personal development, both for individuals and groups and to improve the living and working environment .
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Accommodation/housing
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Devon
- Dorset
- Oxfordshire
- Swindon
Governance
- 25 January 1999: Standard registration
- 04 January 2017: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 04 January 2017: Funds transferred to 1169016 LONGLEIGH FOUNDATION
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £90.58k | £134.64k | £61.35k | £6.47k | £3.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £98.13k | £140.87k | £82.93k | £4.49k | £2.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 22 September 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 20 May 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | 19 May 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | 19 May 2014 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 11 JANUARY 1999 AS AMENDED BY DEED OF VARIATION DATED 30 MARCH 2006.
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE POVERTY AMONGST PERSONS AGED 16 TO 25 YEARS BY THE PROVISION OF SHORT TERM TEMPORARY ACCOMMODATION AND TO ADVANCE EDUCATION TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES AMONGST SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
POOLE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window