BOW MUSLIM COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing help and assistance, mainly educational and religious, to the local Muslim community to overcome their disadvantages and improve their condition of life
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Tower Hamlets
Governance
- 10 May 1999: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MOHAMMAD SHAMSUL HOQUE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Tanbir Ahmed Jaigirdar | Trustee | 12 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
ILAS MOHAMMED | Trustee |
|
||||||
MOHAMMAD MUKTOR MIAH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ASSADDOR ALI | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £133.60k | £121.50k | £164.22k | £163.63k | £171.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £40.95k | £27.82k | £34.20k | £37.18k | £54.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £25.35k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 February 2025 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 February 2025 | 20 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 01 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 March 2021 | 37 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 09 March 2021 | 37 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON THE 7TH OF JUNE 1998, AMENDED ON THE 9TH APRIL 1999.
Charitable objects
ESTABLISHED FOR THE BENEFITS OF PERSONS IN THE BOW NEIGHBORHOOD OF THE LONDON BOROUGH OF TOWER HAMLETS AND IN PARTICULAR THE MUSLIM COMMUNITY , TO ADVANCE THE MUSLIM RELIGION , ADVANCE EDUCATION , RELIEVE POVERTY , AND PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE ABOVE-MENTIONED PERSONS.
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF TOWER HAMLETS
Contact information
- Address:
-
515B - 517 ROMAN ROAD
BOW
LONDON
E3 5EL
- Phone:
- 02089834485
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window