Financial history CAPEL UNDODAIDD CAPEL Y GROES / CAPEL Y GROES UNITARIAN CHAPEL

Charity number: 1071241
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £11.30k £21.73k £19.19k £15.58k £13.89k
Total expenditure £36.87k £21.12k £15.88k £8.36k £13.21k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £380 N/A £6.12k N/A £200