LYDFORD SPORTS FIELD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Aims to provide recreational and sporting facilities for the people of Lydford, Devon
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Devon
Governance
- 16 March 1999: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Hollingsworth | Trustee | 06 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Gilpin | Trustee | 20 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Felicity Jordan | Trustee | 10 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL ERIC CROCKER | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.70k | £0 | £428 | £3.76k | £1.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.71k | £2.68k | £1.48k | £1.05k | £4.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £13.70k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 07 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 14 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 November 2021 | 19 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 23 DECEMBER 1952
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE SAID PROPERTY ASSURED UPON TRUST TO BE APPROPRIATED AND USED FOR THE MAINTENANCE AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL WELL BEING OF THE PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE PARISH OF LYDFORD IN THE COUNTY OF DEVON BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR PHYSICAL TRAINING AND RECREATION SUBJECT TO THE POWERS AND PROVISIONS AS TO THE GENERAL MANAGEMENT AND CONTROL OF THE SAID PROPERTY MORE PARTICULARLY MENTIONED AND SET OUT IN THE SECOND SCHEDULE.
Area of benefit
LYDFORD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Moorlodge
Lydford
OKEHAMPTON
Devon
EX20 4AU
- Phone:
- 07500737724
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window