Financial history CENTRE FOR FREUDIAN ANALYSIS AND RESEARCH

Charity number: 1085368
Charity reporting is up to date (26 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £103.95k £103.95k £122.13k £109.50k £149.66k
Total expenditure £119.84k £119.84k £58.47k £102.15k £111.03k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A