CHRIST APOSTOLIC CHURCH (GOSPEL GENERATION)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROPAGATION OF THE GOSPEL OF OUR LORD AND SAVIOUR JESUS CHRIST. CHANGING GENERATION WITH A HEART FOR GOD IMPARTING LIVES, INFLUENCING COMMUNITIES
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £52,862 from 1 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Barking And Dagenham
- Enfield
- Newham
- Redbridge
- Waltham Forest
Governance
- 28 October 1998: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Adekunle Ayeni | Chair | 05 January 2024 |
|
|||||
Akindele Bakarey | Trustee | 21 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Evangelist FLORENCE FUNKE ADEYEMI | Trustee | 26 April 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £156.37k | £156.37k | £220.14k | £210.05k | £172.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £126.96k | £126.96k | £110.63k | £123.06k | £135.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £16.77k | £16.94k | £52.86k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 January 2025 | 70 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 09 January 2025 | 70 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 15 March 2024 | 136 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 15 March 2024 | 136 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 05 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 09 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 December 2020 | 59 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 December 2020 | 59 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19TH APRIL 1997 AS AMENDED ON 23RD SEPTEMBER 1998.
Charitable objects
(1) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY PROPAGATING THE GOSPEL OF OUR LORD JESUS CHRIST AND PROCLAIMING THE KINGDOM OF GOD THROUGH PREACHING THE WORD OF GOD, LECTURES, PUBLICATIONS, PRAYER AND THE DISTRIBUTION OF GOSPEL TRACTS, AND BY ENSURING SPIRITUAL GROWTH OF MEMBERS AND ENCOURAGING THEM TO LIVE A LIFE OF RIGHTEOUSNESS, HOLINESS AND PREVAILING PRAYER (B) TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND SICKNESS BY PROVIDING CARE FOR THE NEEDY AND BY CO-OPERATING WITH OTHER CHARITABLE AND CHRISTIAN ORGANISATIONS TO OFFER HELP BOTH FINANCIALLY AND OTHERWISE TO VICTIMS OF WAR, DISASTER AND OTHER MISFORTUNES, BOTH NATIONALLY AND INTERNATIONALLY.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
12-14 FERNDALE ROAD
LONDON
E11 3DN
- Phone:
- 02085563031
- Email:
- info@gospelgeneration.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window