NORTH LONDON MOSQUE TRUST(MASJID-E-QUBA)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our objectives are the advancement of religion, advancement of education, relief of poverty, distress and sickness with a particular emphasis on the local Muslim community. At our premises, we provide facilities for daily communal worship, matrimonial services, funerary services, guidance and counselling services, and educational classes for children and adults.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
11 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Hackney
Governance
- 20 August 1998: Standard registration
- NORTH LONDON MOSQUE TRUST (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Abdur Rahim Mulla | Chair | 05 November 2023 |
|
|||||||
YUNUS KAPADIA | Trustee | 05 November 2023 |
|
|||||||
EUSOOF DAWOOD AMERAT | Trustee | 09 November 2014 |
|
|||||||
MOHAMED SAEED ALI BHAI DANA | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £326.96k | £362.32k | £276.81k | £313.77k | £285.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £216.74k | £277.56k | £237.61k | £219.53k | £233.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17TH NOVEMBER 1996
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE RELIGION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TENETS AND DOCTRINES OF THE ISLAMIC FAITH, BELONGING TO THE AHLE SUNNAH WAL JAMAAT. (B) TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE MUSLIM COMMUNITY IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND IN PARTICULAR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, DISTRESS AND SICKNESS.
Area of benefit
HACKNEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
70-72 CAZENOVE ROAD
LONDON
N16 6AA
- Phone:
- 02088066540
- Email:
- info@masjidequba.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window