NATIONAL COCHLEAR IMPLANT USERS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1073222
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Support for Cochlear Implant Users Campaign for all people in the UK who would benefit from a cochlear implant to be offered one.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £7,637
Total expenditure: £10,247

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 07 January 1999: Standard registration
  • 16 March 2021: Funds received from 1099169 HOME COUNTIES COCHLEAR IMPLANT GROUP
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • NCIUA (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Nigel Anthony Stephen Williams MCIPS Chair
None on record
Steve Rumball Trustee 15 June 2024
None on record
Zrinka Mendas Trustee 15 June 2024
None on record
RICHARD BYRNES Trustee 14 June 2014
None on record
PAUL TOMLINSON Trustee
None on record
JENNY BURDGE Trustee
None on record
Dr RAYMOND GLOVER Trustee
None on record
MRS TRICIA KEMP Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £9.45k £18.76k £7.11k £13.04k £7.64k
Total expenditure £9.03k £4.06k £4.29k £21.82k £10.25k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 22 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 14 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 18 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 03 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 25 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
7 ELDRIDGE CLOSE
DORCHESTER
DT1 2JS
Phone:
01305262591