THE TIPTON ST JOHN COMMUNITY HALL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Tipton St John Community Hall is used extensively by a variety of organizations in the village and the surrounding area, including the adjacent Primary School. Hallmark level 3 (the top quality standard) was achieved in August 2015. The trustees are committed to fairness and transparency in all dealings relating to the hire of the facilities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Devon
Governance
- 07 September 1998: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN RAYMOND BELTON | Chair | 01 January 2004 |
|
|||||
Jon Price | Trustee | 11 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Liz Price | Trustee | 11 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard Radcliffe | Trustee | 11 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Turnbull | Trustee | 11 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jane Kyle Hayes | Trustee | 01 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Sadler | Trustee | 28 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Neil Bray | Trustee | 16 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Brian Rice | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.88k | £27.20k | £33.94k | £24.85k | £29.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.31k | £15.59k | £13.11k | £28.12k | £42.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £19.43k | £10.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 05 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 05 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 July 2024 | 156 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 2ND JULY 1998
Charitable objects
TO OPERATE AND MAINTAIN AN ATTRACTIVE VILLAGE HALL WHICH IS AVAILABLE TO A WIDE VARIETY OF LOCAL ORGANISATIONS, BODIES OF ACTIVITIES E.G.. VILLAGE SCHOOL (GYMNASIUM & LUNCHES) TIPTON PLAYERS THEATRE GROUP, CUBS, PCC MEETINGS, BAND PRACTICE, YOUTH CLUB, SENIORS CLUB, ACOLITES BRIDGE CLUB, PANTOMIME SOCIETY, CRICKET CLUB, OWLETTS PLAYGROUP, TABLE TENNIS, TIPTON T- SQUARES (DANCING) ETC. TO OBTAIN GRANTS FOR THE MODERNISATION OF AND IMPROVEMENTS TO THE HALL.
Area of benefit
THE VILLAGE OF TIPTON ST JOHN & VENN OTTERY, OTTERY ST MARY , DEVON.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Tipton St. John Community Hall
Tipton St. John
SIDMOUTH
EX10 0AF
- Phone:
- 01404813431
- Email:
- thebeltons@talk21.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window