Financial history THE CULMINGTON HALL COMMUNITY CENTRE / COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION (NORTHFIELD)

Charity number: 1071842
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £3.71k £3.86k £9.82k £6.85k £7.89k
Total expenditure £2.50k £3.43k £2.46k £5.17k £4.86k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A