NEXUS TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Nexus primary function is to provide musical tuition and biblical studies on a full-time one year course. This is available regardless of faith. Additional activities include provision of venue facilities, recording studios, and instrument tuition to the local community. Performance bands are trained and equiped to work in both a youth context and for general public entertainment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Coventry City
Governance
- 08 January 1999: Standard registration
- 18 January 2020: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 18 January 2020: Funds transferred to 1121751 NEXUS INSTITUTE OF CREATIVE ARTS
- ACADEMY OF MUSIC MINISTRY (Working name)
- AMM (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2013 | 31/08/2014 | 31/08/2015 | 31/08/2016 | 31/08/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £190 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £34.72k | £33.70k | £32.38k | £31.68k | £507.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2017 | 19 March 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2016 | 29 June 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2016 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 12 AUGUST 1998 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 25 NOVEMBER 1998
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION THE RELIEF OF POVERTY SICKNESS OR HARDSHIP AND OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE THROUGHOUT THE WORLD
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window