Cancer Support Suffolk

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Set up in 1998,Cancer Support Suffolk, helps people before, during and after cancer.Our dedicated team includes complementary therapists,counsellors, educators, ambassadors and business brains that come together to educate and support the people of Suffolk about cancer. We are inherently local.We believe in this little slice of the UK, it's home.That's why all money raised stays within the county.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
Total income includes £125,850 from 4 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Essex
- Suffolk
Governance
- 11 January 1999: Standard registration
- CCIS APPEAL (Working name)
- THE CCIS APPEAL (Working name)
- CANCER CAMPAIGN IN SUFFOLK (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jonathan Wynne Ripman | Chair | 13 July 1998 |
|
|||||
Jonathan George Shelton Agar DL | Trustee | 21 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Teresa Ann Budrey | Trustee | 21 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rosetta Richardson | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Runnacles | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|||||
Chris Gray | Trustee | 30 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
DR LIZ SHERWIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN BUTTON FRICS | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £112.03k | £80.94k | £179.34k | £142.26k | £142.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £127.77k | £110.85k | £89.90k | £130.45k | £165.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £85.28k | £1.00k | £125.85k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 11 June 2024 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 11 June 2024 | 11 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 26 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 26 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 04 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 04 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 24 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 24 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 27 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 27 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13TH JULY 1998, AND AMENDED 10TH DECEMBER 1998 as amended on 15 Nov 2023 as amended on 10 Jun 2024
Charitable objects
The relief and prevention of cancer within the County of Suffolk. To support the care of those suffering with the disease. To assist with the improvement of facilities and support of projects concerned with the prevention and treatment of cancer and in the advancement of knowledge in the prevention, diagnosis and treatment of cancer.
Area of benefit
SUFFOLK
Contact information
- Address:
-
58 St. Margarets Street
Ipswich
Suffolk
IP4 2BD
- Phone:
- 01473211884
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window