READING REFUGEE SUPPORT GROUP (RRSG)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2005
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bracknell Forest
- Reading
- Slough
- West Berkshire
- Windsor And Maidenhead
- Wokingham
Governance
- 12 August 1998: Standard registration
- 15 May 2006: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 15 May 2006: Funds transferred to 1098058 Refugee Support Group
- READING REFUGEE SUPPORT GROUP (Working name)
- READING AND BERKSHIRE REFUGEE SUPPORT GROUP (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2005 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £57.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £73.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 31 December 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 31 December 2005 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 SEPTEMBER 1995 AS AMENDED ON 7 FEBRUARY 2002.
Charitable objects
A. TO PROVIDE RELIEF TO REFUGEES, AND ASYLUM SEEKERS (INCLUDING THOSE GRANTED EXCEPTIONAL LEAVE TO REMAIN) AND THEIR DEPENDANTS, REGARDLESS OF THEIR RACE, COLOUR, NATIONALITY, ETHNIC ORIGIN, RELIGION, SEX, MARITAL STATUS, SEXUALITY, SOCIAL CLASS, DISABILITY OR HIV STATUS, WHO ARE RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT AND IN CONDITIONS OF NEED AND DISTRESS (FOR DETAILS OF B, C, D, E & F PLEASE SEE CONSTITUTION
Area of benefit
BERKSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window