ASPERGER EAST ANGLIA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ASPERGER EAST ANGLIA (AEA) PROVIDES A COMPREHENSIVE AND INTEGRATED SERVICE FOR CHILDREN, YOUNG PEOPLE AND ADULTS WITH ASPERGER SYNDROME (AS) AND ALL THOSE AFFECTED BY AS. AEA WORKS IN PARTNERSHIP WITH STATUTORY SERVICES AND OTHER PARTNERS TO RAISE PUBLIC AWARENESS. AEA PROVIDES SUPPORT GROUPS AND OFFERS INFORMATION AND ADVICE ON MANY ISSUES INCLUDING EDUCATION, TRAINING, BENEFITS AND EMPLOYMENT
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £173,637 from 2 government contract(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Cambridgeshire
- Norfolk
- Suffolk
Governance
- 17 March 1999: Standard registration
- ASPERGER NORFOLK (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JERRY ELLIOTT | Chair |
|
|
|||||
ROWENA ALSTON | Trustee | 03 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
JULIE ELLIOTT | Trustee | 05 October 2020 |
|
|||||
FIONA JANE HARE | Trustee | 10 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Andrew Ronald Good | Trustee | 10 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR PETER LANGDON | Trustee | 03 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr ELIZABETH KERSHAW BSCPGCEPHD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr EKKEHART FA STAUFENBERG CONSULTANT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £369.27k | £550.84k | £399.24k | £411.86k | £403.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £370.94k | £385.08k | £430.21k | £410.40k | £434.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £51.81k | £38.82k | £105.47k | £40.00k | £173.64k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £122.66k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £96.22k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £366.96k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £87.66k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £376.79k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £8.29k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £2.46k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 07 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 11 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 19 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 20 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST SEALED ON 8TH JULY 1998 AND AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 2ND FEBRUARY 1999 AND 8TH JUNE 2004.
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE CHILDREN AND ADULTS WHO ARE DIAGNOSED AS SUFFERING FROM ASPERGER SYNDROME AND IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT AND ASSISTANCE TO SUCH PERSONS AND THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS.
Area of benefit
THE WIDER REGION OF EAST ANGLIA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Charing Cross Centre
17-19 St. John Maddermarket
NORWICH
NR2 1DN
- Phone:
- 01603620500
- Email:
- info@asperger.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window