SPORTS AID LONDON

Charity number: 1070959
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To raise funds to provide grants for children and young people in the London area to assist in the development of their physical education.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 July 2012

Total income: £27,510
Total expenditure: £14,762

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout London

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 August 1998: Standard registration
  • 13 November 2013: Removed (Amalgamated)
  • 13 November 2013: Funds transferred to 1111612 SPORTS AID TRUST
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • SPORTSAID LONDON (Working name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2008 31/07/2009 31/07/2010 31/07/2011 31/07/2012
Total gross income £102.51k £382.62k £177.24k £175.15k £27.51k
Total expenditure £133.95k £331.62k £196.11k £171.51k £14.76k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 31 July 2012 27 March 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2012 27 March 2013 On Time
Annual return 31 July 2011 20 June 2012 20 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2011 20 June 2012 20 days late
Annual return 31 July 2010 23 February 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2010 23 February 2011 On Time