SPORTS AID WEST MIDLANDS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Raising of funds and applying those funds as grants to assist British sportsmen and women
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2009
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Birmingham City
- Herefordshire
- Shropshire
- Staffordshire
- Warwickshire
- Worcestershire
Governance
- SPORTSAID WEST MIDLANDS (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/07/2009 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.09k | £6.84k | £2.40k | £581 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.78k | £4.88k | £3.12k | £559 | £29 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2009 | 16 February 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2009 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 16 January 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | 27 January 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 27 November 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | 04 December 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 27 November 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 27 January 2007 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 3RD JUNE 1998
Charitable objects
(1) TO ADVANCE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PERSONS WHO ARE PUPILS AT SCHOOLS COLLEGES AND UNIVERSITIES IN THE WEST MIDLANDS REGION OF ENGLAND BY ENSURING THAT DUE ATTENTION IS GIVEN TO THE PHYSICAL EDUCATION OF SUCH PUPILS AS WELL AS TO THE DEVELOPMENT AND OCCUPATION OF THEIR MINDS AND WITH A VIEW TO FURTHERING THAT OBJECT TO PROVIDE FUNDS AND TO ASSIST IN THE ORGANISATION AND PROVISION OF FACILITIES WHICH WILL ENABLE AND ENCOURAGE SUCH PUPILS TO PARTICIPATE IN PHYSICAL RECREATION AND SPORT; (2) IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE TO PROVIDE FUNDS OR TO ORGANISE OR PROVIDE (OR ASSIST IN THE ORGANISATION AND PROVISION OF) FACILITIES FOR RECREATION IN THE WEST MIDLANDS REGION OF ENGLAND (WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE PERSONS FOR WHOM THE SAME ARE PROVIDED) FOR PERSONS WHO BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES; (3) SUCH OBJECTS AND PURPOSES IN THE WEST MIDLANDS REGION OF ENGLAND BEING OBJECTS AND PURPOSES EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES.
Area of benefit
WEST MIDLANDS REGION OF ENGLAND
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window