SLOUGH COMMUNITY DRIVE PROJECT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2005
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Slough
Governance
- 30 March 1999: Standard registration
- 04 January 2007: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- SCDP (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £36.90k | £37.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £37.22k | £35.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 09 February 2006 | 9 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 8 MARCH 1999
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN DRIVING AND MECHANICAL SKILLS WITH THE AIM OF IMPROVING ROAD SAFETY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN SLOUGH AND DISTRICT IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF INSTRUCTION.
Area of benefit
SLOUGH AND DISTRICT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window