Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF WHEELOCK SCHOOL

Charity number: 1073037
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2024 16 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2023 27 August 2024 88 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2022 13 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 26 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 10 June 2021 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required