Accounts and annual returns EYAM C OF E (C) PRIMARY SCHOOL PTFA

Charity number: 1102917
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 18 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 18 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 09 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 15 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 05 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 05 April 2021 279 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required