LEE PRIOR & LUCINDA BARRY CHARITABLE FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 25 August 1998: Standard registration
- 16 November 2006: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- TH E PRIOR FOUNDATION (Working name)
- THE PRIOR FAMILY CHARITABLE FOUNDATION (Working name)
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2004 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2004 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE 21ST APRIL 1998
Charitable objects
TO PAY OR APPLY THE WHOLE OF THE INCOME AND THE CAPITAL OF THE TRUST FUND TO OR TOWARDS OR IN FURTHERANCE OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH ONE OR MORE CHARITIES CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS OR CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window