ROYAL AIR FORCES ASSOCIATION HERNE BAY BRANCH

Charity Number: 1070919
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Supporting the Royal Air Forces Association Headquarters

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £1,615
Total expenditure: £844

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Kent

Governance

Registration history:
  • 07 August 1998: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Simon Haseltine Trustee 18 February 2025
3RD WHITSTABLE (ALL SAINTS) SCOUT GROUP
Received: On time
Roger Dengate Trustee 18 February 2025
None on record
RUSSELL FEAST Trustee 13 February 2024
WHITSTABLE AND DISTRICT CHORAL SOCIETY
Received: On time
Alan Leonard Weston Trustee 13 February 2024
None on record
JOHN GASKELL Trustee 01 March 2016
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £520 £250 £351 £341 £1.62k
Total expenditure £2.05k £60 £396 £451 £844
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 19 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2023 13 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 30 April 2024 182 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 14 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 26 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Flat 6
Bay View
70 Central Parade
HERNE BAY
Kent
CT6 5JQ
Phone:
07722 906946
Website:

No information available