FISHGUARD INVASION CENTRE TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Permanent display of The Last Invasion Tapestry and the generation of funds for the Invasion Centre through talks and guided tours.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Pembrokeshire
Governance
- 09 October 1998: Standard registration
- LAST INVASION CENTRE (Working name)
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Gullen Morgan | Trustee | 10 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
JACQUELINE ANN STOKES | Trustee | 10 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
William Cuthbert Linton Shaw | Trustee | 10 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
GEOFFREY CHARLES STICKLER | Trustee | 20 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
EDWARD PERKINS | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|||||
RICHARD DAVIES | Trustee |
|
||||||
PROF ANTHONY JOHN DAVIES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HEDYDD HUGHES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.69k | £163 | £16.76k | £4.70k | £4.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.04k | £1.59k | £1.66k | £13.23k | £12.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £16.46k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 10 November 2024 | 41 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 29 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 10 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 24 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 12 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 25TH AUGUST 1998
Charitable objects
ARE TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN AND KNOWLEDGE OF HISTORY AND PAST AND CONTEMPORARY LITERARY VISUAL DRAMATIC AND MUSICAL ARTS AND CRAFTS WITH PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVE REFERENCE TO THOSE OF THE NORTHERN AREAS OF HT COUNTY OF PEMBROKE ANCIENTLY COMPRISED IN THE HUNDREDS OF DEWISLAND AND CEMMAES BY MOUNTING AND PROVIDING ACCOMMODATION AND FACILITIES FOR EXHIBITIONS DISPLAYS LECTURES AND CLASSES AND TO OR FOR SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE CHARITY MAY DECIDE INCLUDING GIFTS TO OR FOR OTHER CHARITABLE ORGANISATIONS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.IN PRACTICE IN PEMBROKESHIRE ( FISHGUARD AND GOODWICK).
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 Heol Y Felin
GOODWICK
Pembrokeshire
SA64 0AR
- Phone:
- 07599239881
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window