ROYAL NAVAL ASSOCIATION SELSEY BRANCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
GENERAL COMRADESHIP OF EX ROYAL NAVAL AND ROYAL MARINES AND WRENS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- West Sussex
Governance
- 29 July 1998: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID GEORGE TINDALE | Chair | 13 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Brian Hall | Trustee | 12 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Mcintosh | Trustee | 19 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ian Stocks | Trustee | 13 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
GEOFFREY BAISDEN | Trustee | 03 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
VERA MAY BASSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GAVIN RORISTON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.25k | £3.86k | £4.84k | £5.48k | £6.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.29k | £4.22k | £6.64k | £8.43k | £8.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 14 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SUPPLEMENTAL ROYAL CHARTER AND RULES AND BYE LAWS OF THE RNA (266982)
Charitable objects
AS PER RNA (266982)
Area of benefit
SELSEY, WEST SUSSEX
Contact information
- Address:
-
37 Dennys Close
Selsey
CHICHESTER
PO20 0RA
- Phone:
- 01243606605
- Email:
- hollydogtwig@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window