SCAMPTON PLAYMATES
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE CHARITY IS RUN TO PROVIDE WRAP-AROUND CHILDCARE FACILITY FOR 0 - 5 YRS AND AN EVENING AFTERSCHOOL CLUB FOR PRIMARY SCHOOL CHILDREN.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2017
Total income includes £246,539 from government contract(s) and £93,425 from government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 30 July 1998: Standard registration
- 21 May 2018: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2013 | 31/05/2014 | 31/05/2015 | 31/05/2016 | 30/09/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £227.85k | £328.23k | £279.82k | £262.34k | £342.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £255.48k | £315.07k | £279.85k | £277.60k | £384.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £246.54k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £93.43k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2017 | 02 May 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2017 | 02 May 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 May 2016 | 25 November 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2016 | 25 November 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 May 2015 | 20 November 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2015 | 20 November 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 May 2014 | 04 June 2015 | 65 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2014 | 04 June 2015 | 65 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30 JUNE 1998
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS
Area of benefit
SCAMPTON, LINCOLNSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window