CHEER TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We offer Comfort, Hope, Empathy, Encouragement and Rebuilding through effective programmes of self-help groups, Advocacy and Counselling.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
18 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
Governance
- 01 June 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr GIANCARLO ELIA | Chair |
|
||||||
George Justin Rocke | Trustee | 31 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr DAVID MICHAEL DE JONCOURT WILMOT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/03/2020 | 30/03/2021 | 30/03/2022 | 30/03/2023 | 30/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £98.84k | £94.32k | £86.93k | £103.89k | £73.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £78.97k | £67.53k | £73.88k | £80.14k | £90.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 March 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 March 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 March 2022 | 07 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2022 | 08 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 March 2021 | 19 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 March 2020 | 18 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2020 | 18 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 11 NOVEMBER 2003
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, IN PARTICULAR FOR THE BENEFIT OF DISTRESSED SINGLE PARENTS, EITHER DIVORCED, WIDOWED, SEPARATED OR UNMARRIED, THEIR DEPENDANTS, AND CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN LONDON AND THE SURROUNDING AREA AND ELSEWHERE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM, AND OTHER TERRITORIES BY:- A) ADVANCING THEIR EDUCATION AND DEVELOPMENT PARTICULARLY WITH A VIEW TO ASSISTING THEM IN IMPROVING THEIR WELFARE, AND THEIR UNDERSTANDING OF ENTITLEMENTS UNDER LAW; B) PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THEIR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WHICH MAY INCLUDE ARTISTIC AND CREATIVE ACTIVITIES SUCH AS PERFORMANCES OF MUSIC, DANCE AND DRAMA, RECORDING OF MUSIC, FILM, VIDEO-MAKING, DESIGN AND TECHNOLOGY IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE, SO AS TO ASSIST THEM IN GROWING TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND AS MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND SO THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED; C) PROVIDING COUNSELLING AND ADVOCACY SERVICES D
Area of benefit
LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
23 Calbourne Road
London
SW12 8LW
- Phone:
- 07785583442
- Email:
- admin@cheertrust.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window