Financial history MIND IN BRIGHTON & HOVE

Charity number: 1071434
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.87m £1.34m £1.01m £1.06m £1.12m
Total expenditure £1.71m £1.18m £1.06m £1.06m £1.07m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £978.17k £1.03m
Income from government grants £1.67m £1.28m £938.25k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £59.22k £53.99k £55.12k £44.90k £20.71k
Income - Other trading activities £54.55k £6.57k £8.39k £25.04k £28.30k
Income - Charitable activities £1.75m £1.28m £938.25k £978.17k £1.04m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £6.61k £5.31k £3.52k £9.96k £29.84k
Income - Other £3.00k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £10.00k £14 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.71m £1.18m £1.06m £1.06m £1.06m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £1.15k £1.04k
Expenditure - Governance £4.21k £4.81k £5.44k £5.59k £6.33k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0