PORTLAND SINGERS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Portland Singers is a small choir which gives concerts for the benefit of churches or other charitable organisations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Charitable Activities
- Dorset
Governance
- 16 March 1999: Standard registration
- 19 August 2022: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Investment
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2017 | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.57k | £1.97k | £2.37k | £1.61k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.69k | £2.17k | £2.03k | £1.87k | £848 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 13 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 06 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2018 | 18 January 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2018 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON THE 8 JANUARY 1999.
Charitable objects
1) THE STUDY AND PRACTICE OF CHORAL MUSIC IN ORDER TO FOSTER PUBLIC KNOWLEDGE AND APPRECIATION OF SUCH MUSIC BY MEANS OF PUBLIC PERFORMANCE; B) TO ASSIST AND SUPPORT SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS OR PURPOSES AS THE COMMITTEE SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE IN WEYMOUTH AND PORTLAND
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window