PATHWAYS TO CARE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Local Charity providing services mainly for the housebound, elderly and young people wishing to find a particular service in the area ie transport to hospital or doctor which falls outside the normal car service provided, help with shopping, gardening etc. Short term provision of food for those experiencing a temporary break in benefits, or, for whatever reason, are unable to buy food.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
53 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Dorset
Governance
- 21 December 1998: Standard registration
- 18 January 2023: Funds received from 229199 CHANCERY HOUSE
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Jennifer Herman | Chair | 27 November 2014 |
|
|||||
Gillian Rosemary Eve Tarling | Trustee | 22 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Alan Jenkins | Trustee | 30 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
GEOFF VAINE | Trustee | 09 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Rosemary Edwards | Trustee | 09 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Connel Burns | Trustee | 24 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Barbara Hildegard Jenkins | Trustee | 31 January 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.13k | £11.99k | £12.74k | £24.76k | £23.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.37k | £10.39k | £14.71k | £16.68k | £23.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £1.00k | N/A | £3.35k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 22 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 09 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 03 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 08 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 13 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 5 NOVEMBER 1998
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF THE SICK, THE AGED, THE DISABLED AND OTHER PERSONS IN NEED OF SUCH RELIEF, BY THE PROVISION OF VOLUNTARY SHORT-TERM ASSISTANCE AND BY PROVISION AND INFORMATION ADVICE ABOUT STATUTORY AND VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS PROVIDING SUCH ASSISTANCE
Area of benefit
BRIDPORT AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Warne Hill
Bridport
DT6 4AQ
- Phone:
- 07538289392
- Email:
- ruth_jenkins@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window