Financial history COMMUNITY BARNET

Charity number: 1071035
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.25m £1.32m £1.49m £1.52m £1.60m
Total expenditure £1.35m £1.35m £1.50m £1.41m £1.66m
Income from government contracts £1.02m £1.19m N/A N/A £1.34m
Income from government grants £17.28k N/A £195.49k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £2.15k £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.16m £1.25m £1.35m £1.41m £1.56m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £50 £55 £69 £84
Income - Other £89.95k £65.90k £140.86k £108.59k £39.91k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.35m £1.35m £1.50m £1.41m £1.66m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £5.63k £0 £6.80k £6.60k £6.90k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0