Financial history THE COMPANY OF FOUR MUSICAL THEATRE SOCIETY

Charity number: 1071678
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £74.00k £20.76k £23.71k £64.71k £70.60k
Total expenditure £40.07k £12.39k £33.84k £58.32k £78.25k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £18.71k £2.67k N/A N/A