BENGALI WOMENS GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Bengali womens group provides various activities for local Bangladeshi Women. The main aims are to encourage and engage them so as to build their confidence and to emopwer them to become more independant and take control of their own lives. The Activities we provide are: Advice Keepfit Lunch Club Gardening Project Training
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2021
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Southwark
Governance
- 23 December 1998: Standard registration
- BENGALI WOMEN'S GROUP (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NILUFFER FAROOKI | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Janer Sharif | Trustee | 19 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Hadia Begum | Trustee | 15 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
HASNA BEGUM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MONESA HUSSAIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS HYE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LAILA ANJUMAN BANU | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.18k | £7.05k | £5.50k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.51k | £5.92k | £4.90k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £4.93k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 461 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 461 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 826 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 826 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 February 2022 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 26TH NOVEMBER 1998
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF GREATER LONDON AND IN PARTICULAR FOR THE BENEFIT OF THOSE INHABITANTS WHO ARE WOMEN FROM BANGLADESH OR OTHER PARTS OF THE SOUTH EAST ASIA; OR ARE OF BANGLADESHI OR SOUTH ASIAN DESCENT, BY ADVANCING EDUCATION, BY PROVIDING ASSISTANCE TO THOSE WHO ARE IN NEED AND BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANT
Area of benefit
GREATER LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
ROCKINGHAM COMMUNITY CENTRE
FALMOUTH ROAD
LONDON
SE1 6QP
- Phone:
- 02074039888
- Email:
- bwomensgroup@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window