Linked charities NEW COMMUNITY NETWORK
Charity number: 1072645

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Linked charities
Governing document
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 27/11/1982
AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 31/01/2000
AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 27/10/2005
AS AMENDED ON 17/02/2009
AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 05/03/2015
Charitable objects
THE NET PROCEEDS OF SALE MUST BE USED FOR THE PURPOSES OF REST, CONVALESCENCE, RECOVERY AND RECREATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED BY REASON OF AGE, YOUTH, INFIRMITY, DISABILITY, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
- 25 February 2009 : Standard registration
- 21 January 2016 : Removed
- 21 January 2016 : Asset transfer out
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.