HORTON CUM STUDLEY MILLENNIUM VILLAGE HALL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Village Hall and Playing Field
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £301 from 1 government contract(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 04 September 1998: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stuart Clive MacFarlane | Chair | 16 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Foxcroft | Trustee | 21 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Margaret Jewell | Trustee | 19 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Derek Jewell | Trustee | 21 March 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.64k | £14.14k | £8.92k | £15.07k | £15.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.51k | £12.17k | £6.93k | £9.44k | £13.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £440 | £301 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 4 SEPTEMBER 1998
Charitable objects
FOR THE PURPOSES OF A RECREATION GROUND AND VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS AND IN PARTICULAR FOR USE IN MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS
Area of benefit
HORTON-CUM-STUDLEY AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
MVH Straight Mile
HORTON-CUM-STUDLEY
OXFORD
OX33 1AD
- Phone:
- 07906216549
- Email:
- treasurerhcsmvh@gmail.com
- Website:
-
horton-cum-studley.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window