Financial history COMMUNITY ACTION MACHYNLLETH AND DISTRICT

Charity number: 1071497
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £65.72k £65.41k £67.28k £68.59k £23.25k
Total expenditure £50.63k £61.33k £64.63k £64.87k £49.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £4.24k N/A
Income from government grants £9.39k £1.28k £18.03k £7.50k £5.06k