DONNA'S DREAM HOUSE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
"The Relief of Children and Teenagers with Life Treatening Illnesses by and the provision of Free Holiday Accommodation and theire Families To oversee and administer all Management,Control and Provision as required to objectives
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 21 May 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 10 December 1998: Standard registration
- 09 March 2017: Funds received from 258714 THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF ROSSALL AND FLEETWOOD HOS...
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LEONARD JAMES CURTIS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
VIOLET MCINTYRE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
VICE CHAIRMAN MICK SUGDEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BARBARA CURTIS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 21/05/2020 | 21/05/2021 | 21/05/2022 | 21/05/2023 | 21/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £178.36k | £192.72k | £125.20k | £214.11k | £173.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £144.75k | £156.28k | £189.55k | £219.33k | £185.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £56.50k | £89.35k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 21 May 2024 | 20 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 21 May 2024 | 20 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 21 May 2023 | 21 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 21 May 2023 | 21 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 21 May 2022 | 20 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 21 May 2022 | 20 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 21 May 2021 | 17 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 21 May 2021 | 17 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 21 May 2020 | 16 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 21 May 2020 | 16 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 1 OCTOBER 1998 AS AMENDED 11 FEBRUARY 2008
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF CHILDREN AND TEENAGERS WITH LIFE THREATENING ILLNESSES BY THE PROVISION OF FREE HOLIDAY EXPERIENCES FOR SUCH CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES. TO PROVIDE AND OBTAIN RESOURCES AND RELIEF IN PARTNERSHIP WITH OTHER CHARITIES, AGENCIES AND THE COMMUNITY TO ACHIEVE FREE HOLIDAY EXPERIENCES FOR CHILDREN, TEENAGERS AND THEIR FAMILIES OR CARERS WITH LIFE ILLNESSES. TO PROVIDE RESOURCES, RELIEF, SUPPORT AND FREE HOLIDAY EXPERIENCES TO BEREAVED SIBLINGS AND THEIR FAMILIES OR CARERS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
21 CHAPEL ST
BLACKPOOL
LANCASHIRE
FY1 5AW
- Phone:
- 01253752222
- Email:
- len@donnasdreamhouse.co.uk
- Website:
-
donnasdreamhouse.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window