Financial history W.I.L.L. WIRRAL INDEPENDENT LIVING AND LEARNING

Charity Number: 1075817
Charity reporting is up to date (2 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £1.61m £1.81m £1.97m £2.09m £2.32m
Total expenditure £1.58m £1.74m £1.87m £1.97m £2.15m
Income from government contracts £1.58m £1.79m £1.95m £262.00k £2.29m
Income from government grants £16.80k £13.94k £17.23k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £239 £14.74k £17.23k £500 £283
Income - Other trading activities £3.84k £0 £0 £0 £39
Income - Charitable activities £1.59m £1.79m £1.96m £2.08m £2.30m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.83k £234 £399 £9.20k £16.85k
Income - Other £18.16k £3.84k £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.58m £1.74m £1.87m £1.97m £2.15m
Expenditure - Raising funds £666 £0 £0 £100 £250
Expenditure - Governance £7.92k £5.99k £7.21k £6.02k £6.02k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0