Financial history JOB CHANGE

Charity number: 1080729
Charity reporting is up to date (4 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £312.14k £400.96k £351.20k £658.52k £260.32k
Total expenditure £275.34k £415.88k £446.47k £374.19k £244.62k
Income from government contracts £112.55k £311.43k £108.66k £528.31k £227.75k
Income from government grants N/A £20.00k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £124.00k N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £528.31k N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £5.61k N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £600 N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £357.96k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £3.06k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £16.23k N/A