WOOLWELL COMMUNITY RESOURCE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the benefits of the inhabitants of Woolwell and the neighbourhood; to bring together the said inhabitants and the local authorities; voluntary and other organisations in a common effort to advance education and to provide facilities in the interests of social welfare for recreation and leisure time occupation with the object of improving the conditions of life and in particular to maint
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £37,861 from 3 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Devon
Governance
- 27 August 1998: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Suzanne Eloise Marsh | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Steven John Marsh | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
CHARLES PHILLIP WILLIAM HUITSON | Trustee | 04 August 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £245.37k | £208.23k | £260.91k | £354.72k | £416.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £261.00k | £189.44k | £241.42k | £296.03k | £389.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £1.82k | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | £11.88k | £83.42k | £90.19k | £20.00k | £37.86k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 16 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 13 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 13 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 February 2022 | 101 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 09 February 2022 | 101 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 March 2021 | 143 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 23 March 2021 | 143 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 13TH JULY 1998.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF WOOLWELL AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD, TOGETHER DEFINED BY THE ADMINISTRATIVE AREA OF THE PARISH OF BICKLEIGH, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS, AND IN PARTICULAR TO ESTABLISH, OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME (WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY). FOR FULL DETAILS SEE CR FILE
Area of benefit
WOOLWELL AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD, TOGETHER DEFINED BY THE ADMINISTRATIVE AREA OF THE PARISH OF BICKLEIGH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
WOOLWELL COMMUNITY & RESOURCE
CENTRE
DARKLAKE LANE
WOOLWELL
PLYMOUTH
PL6 7TR
- Phone:
- 01752695888
- Email:
- info@woolwellcentre.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window