Governing document THE INTERNATIONAL CONTINENCE SOCIETY

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 05/05/1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02/02/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09/10/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24/10/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02/10/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/08/2010 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 01/09/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23/10/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16 SEP 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14 SEP 2017 as amended on 29 Sep 2020 as amended on 25 Nov 2020
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF BASIC AND CLINICAL SCIENCES CONCERNED WITH THE FUNCTION AND DYSFUNCTION OF THE URINARY TRACT, BOWEL AND PELVIC FLOOR
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.