Accounts and annual returns PRECEPT MINISTRIES (UK)

Charity number: 1072938
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2024 11 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2024 11 February 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2023 19 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2023 19 April 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2022 07 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2022 07 March 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2021 12 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2021 12 April 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2020 14 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 14 April 2021 On Time Download Open in new window