Financial history LYNNE GRUNDY MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity number: 1072150
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2019 30/11/2020 30/11/2021 30/11/2022 30/11/2023
Total gross income £2.55k £807 £778 £811 £1.41k
Total expenditure £2.03k £560 £93 £1.83k £2.34k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A