Financial history OUNDLE RURAL MIND

Charity number: 1071432
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2009 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013
Total gross income £58.62k £56.86k £56.70k £39.19k £42.56k
Total expenditure £73.44k £87.09k £48.44k £46.47k £53.30k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A