THE LONDON SHAMBHALA MEDITATION CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Based in Clapham in South London, the London Shambhala Meditation Centre offers meditation instruction and weekend and weekday courses in meditation, Buddhism and the meditative arts. The centre is open for free meditation instruction on Mondays and Wednesdays from 7:15 pm to 9:00 pm. There is no need to book in advance: everyone is welcome to just come along. Instruction is free of charge.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
Governance
- 16 February 1999: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ian Harcus | Trustee | 10 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Bernadette Lax | Trustee | 10 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
David John Morris | Trustee | 13 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rachael Cheang | Trustee | 06 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jane Hope | Trustee | 18 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Hope | Trustee | 02 March 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £91.29k | £61.99k | £47.77k | £46.51k | £74.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £91.44k | £68.35k | £47.06k | £51.66k | £72.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 15 August 2024 | 46 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 15 August 2024 | 46 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 27 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 27 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 11 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 11 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 02 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 02 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 12 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 12 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 27TH JULY 1998
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE PRINCIPLES AND PRACTICES OF BUDDHISM, AND THE RELATED EDUCATIONAL PROGRAMMES OF SHAMBALA TRAINING AND NALANDA EDUCATION. 2.TO ORGANISE MEETINGS, CLASSES AND TRAINING COURSES. 3. TO PUBLISH, ISSUE AND CIRCULATE SUCH PAPERS, BOOKS OR OTHER PUBLICATIONS AS SHALL FURTHER THE SAID OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
27 BELMONT CLOSE
LONDON
SW4 6AY
- Phone:
- 02077203207
- Email:
- info@shambhala.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window