ROYAL AIR FORCES ASSOCIATION ALRESFORD BRANCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Alresford and District branch of the Royal Air Force Association meets every month to conduct its business with the primary purpose of providing support to ex RAF members and their families. We do this by raising funds via donations for the Wings Appeal charity and via our welfare fund, to support members who are ill, or in need of assistance, especially any war injured and their dependants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hampshire
- West Berkshire
Governance
- 18 August 1998: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mike Trevelyan | Chair | 07 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Pascal Zgambo | Trustee | 06 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
LINDA TREVELYAN | Trustee | 07 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julie James | Trustee | 05 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Derek Sweetenham | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.29k | £2.50k | £2.22k | £3.48k | £4.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.81k | £2.62k | £209 | £4.07k | £4.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 21 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 01 November 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 26 JUNE 1996 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 28 MAY 1997.
Charitable objects
AS PER RAFA (226686)
Area of benefit
ALRESFORD, HAMPSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Cranford
Station Approach
Four Marks
ALTON
Hampshire
GU34 5HH
- Phone:
- 07920772781
- Email:
- yann_221@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window