THE DIANA PARKER CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
See Area of Operation entry
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 10 September 1998: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Julian Lipson | Trustee | 11 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
DIANA CLARE PARKER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GILLIAN FRANCES DORAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.54k | £15.00k | £25.00k | £23.07k | £1.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £18.27k | £35.87k | £19.37k | £367 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 05 March 2025 | 28 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 18 April 2024 | 73 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 16 March 2023 | 39 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 27 April 2022 | 81 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 10 June 2021 | 125 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST MADE 3RD APRIL 1998, SUPPLEMENTAL DEED OF APPOINTMENT DATED 26TH JUNE 1998
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE CAPITAL AND INCOME OF THE TRUST FUND UPON TRUST TO APPLY THE INCOME, AND ALL OR SUCH PART OR PARTS OF THE CAPITAL, AT SUCH TIMES OR TIMES AND IN SUCH MANNER TO OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE OBJECTS AND PURPOSES IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
WITHERS LLP
20 OLD BAILEY
LONDON
EC4M 7AN
- Phone:
- 02075976000
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window