THE GORSE MILLENNIUM GREEN TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We run a Millennium Green - a public "pocket park" - situated in Gorsehill Rd., New Brighton, Wallasey, Merseyside, CH45 9JA. Our aims are to maintain and develop this leisure facility for the community by use of grant funding, fundraising and donations from members.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Wirral
Governance
- 24 August 1998: Standard registration
- SAVE THE GORSE (Working name)
- THE GORSE MILLENNUIM GREEN TRUST (Previous name)
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr NEVILLE BRADLEY Chair | Chair | 24 July 1998 |
|
|
||||
Holly Clark | Trustee | 21 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Trevor Chadwick | Trustee | 16 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Katharine Bradley | Trustee | 16 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Claire Joanne Simpson | Trustee | 12 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Downes | Trustee | 11 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
JOHN ANDREW URIEL | Trustee | 24 July 1998 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.46k | £6.32k | £3.14k | £3.99k | £4.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.72k | £3.26k | £3.55k | £3.56k | £3.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 March 2024 | 55 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 February 2022 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 March 2021 | 47 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 24 JULY 1998
Charitable objects
PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF AN OPEN SPACE TO BE KNOWN AS A MILLENNIUM GREEN FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
16 ROLLESTON DRIVE
WALLASEY
CH45 6XG
- Phone:
- 01516382351
- Email:
- john.uriel4@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window