CHAPTER (WEST CHESHIRE) LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Chapter offers support and provides opportunities to people who have a severe and enduring mental illness diagnosis.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £25,480 from 1 government contract(s) and £37,069 from 6 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
24 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Cheshire West & Chester
Governance
- 11 November 1998: Standard registration
- CHAPTER (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Claire Driffield | Trustee | 27 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Joanne Hadley | Trustee | 02 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lee Mooney | Trustee | 09 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Kevin Dionisio Hochard | Trustee | 16 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Gabor Balint | Trustee | 19 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Louise McWatt | Trustee | 19 October 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £197.31k | £319.54k | £426.74k | £245.42k | £294.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £201.93k | £243.42k | £483.98k | £239.39k | £240.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £10.44k | £25.48k | |
|
Income from government grants | £25.48k | £61.99k | £61.45k | £68.39k | £37.07k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 15 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 20 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 22 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 19 DECEMBER 1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 20 OCTOBER 1998 as amended on 19 Oct 2020
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS WHO HAVE OR HAVE HAD MENTAL HEALTH PROBLEMS IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING SERVICES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit D1 Stanlaw Abbey Business
Centre
Dover Drive
ELLESMERE PORT
CH659BF
- Phone:
- 01244344409
- Email:
- info@chaptermentalhealth.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window