FEN BANK GREYHOUND SANCTUARY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To rescue, rehabilitate and re-home in appropriate supported homes, ex-racing greyhounds who come into our care. All homings are vetted and supported for the life of the dog.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Other Defined Groups
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 13 November 1998: Standard registration
- F.B.G.S. (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STELLA PULLUM | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Sarah Martin | Trustee | 18 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN MARTIN | Trustee | 18 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM KEITH FOUNTAIN | Trustee | 19 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
IAN BREACHER | Trustee | 19 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM ARTHUR CRICK | Trustee | 01 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
PAUL BRYAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | 31/10/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £153.02k | £150.09k | £189.62k | £306.07k | £233.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £142.59k | £144.87k | £166.58k | £181.55k | £209.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £20.00k | £24.67k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2024 | 28 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2024 | 28 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 27 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 27 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 02 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 02 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 03 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 03 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 8 OCTOBER 1998
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF GREYHOUNDS WHO HAVE BEEN ABANDONED AND WHO ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION AND TO PLACE THEM IN SUCH PERMANENT HOMES AS THE TRUSTEES CONSIDER APPROPRIATE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
15 HEWITTS MANOR
CLEETHORPES
DN35 9QT
- Phone:
- 07855690246
- Email:
- info@fenbankgreyhounds.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window