WORLD PRAYER CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To encourage the practice and development of prayer through: - teaching in churches and Christian agencies - prayer conferences both in the UK and other nations - days of prayer in Birmingham City Centre - the prayer strategy for UK and Ireland - WPC regular news and prayer updates The focus is Birmingham, the nation and the nations More details are on the web site and our report
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 30 October 1998: Standard registration
- PRAYER CENTRE (Working name)
- WPC (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sheila Hendley | Chair | 07 November 2012 |
|
|||||
Gurbax Bashie Kaur Bains | Trustee | 01 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Blower | Trustee | 01 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joel David Goodlet | Trustee | 11 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
IAN COLE | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £224.18k | £127.85k | £216.37k | £98.50k | £113.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £218.33k | £152.18k | £144.24k | £140.89k | £128.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2023
(These accounts |
30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2022
(These accounts |
24 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2020
(These accounts |
15 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2019
(These accounts |
30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 22 JULY 1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 26 OCTOBER 1998
Charitable objects
TO ESTABLISH A GLOBAL PRAYER CENTRE PROMOTING PRAYER, CHRISTIAN MISSION AROUND THE WORLD, RECREATION, LEARNING FOR THE FAMILY, SOCIAL ACTION SUPPORT AND WHERE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH WILL BE PROMOTED, SHARED AND UPHELD TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AND AS AN EXPRESSION OF CHRISTIAN WITNESS, LOVE AND CONCERN: -TO ADVANCE EDUCATION -TO RELIEVE PERSONS WHO ARE IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ULTIMATE DISCRETION DETERMINE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
World Prayer Centre
167 Newhall Street
Birmingham
B3 1SW
- Phone:
- 0121 633 7393
- Email:
- events@worldprayer.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window